U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00065-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SMITH
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Judgment]
February, 2021
  • February 12, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
  • December 08, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Order]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Order]
  • February 20, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • February 20, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 20, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.