U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00031-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. VEGA
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Judgment]
  • March 18, 2021: [Order to Surrender]
  • March 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • December 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • December 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • December 14, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2020
  • September 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 14, 2020: [Order on Amended Motion]
  • September 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 02, 2020: [Order]
  • July 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2020
  • April 13, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
  • March 13, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • March 13, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.