U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-00012-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. TILLMAN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Judgment]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 07, 2020: [Order]
  • July 02, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2020
  • June 09, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [Order]
  • May 04, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 20, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.