U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-00014-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. WARREN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 13, 2021: [Judgment of Acquittal]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
May, 2021
  • May 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • May 07, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
  • October 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
  • August 05, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 05, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 05, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order]
  • March 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.