U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:20-cr-00010-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. GRADDY et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Judgment]
August, 2021
  • August 04, 2021: [Judgment]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Order]
  • July 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Order]
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Order]
  • March 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
  • October 06, 2020: [Order]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
  • August 06, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • August 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 17, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.