U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00008-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HARRIS et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Judgment]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Judgment]
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Order to Surrender]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Order]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Order]
  • April 07, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 13, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2020
  • July 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Order]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 19, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 17, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.