U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-00057-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SUAREZ-BARRIENTOS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Judgment]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 29, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 28, 2020: [Order]
  • May 28, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 04, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.