U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-00014-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. JONES
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Want of Prosecution]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 02, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2020
  • June 12, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 09, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 08, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 08, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.