U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-00008-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BURTON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Judgment]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 02, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 05, 2021: [Order]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order]
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
  • October 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 16, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 16, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 15, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 15, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.