U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:20-cr-00008-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. LOVEJOY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Judgment]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • March 31, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • March 29, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • March 29, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • March 23, 2021: [Order]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
  • October 05, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 22, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 22, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.