U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00013-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SENIOR
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Judgment]
February, 2021
  • February 15, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 10, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 09, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.