U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00007-8
  • Case Name: USA v. SEALED
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Order Regarding Motion for Sentence Reduction - FIRST STEP ACT]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Order]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order]
  • February 25, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Judgment]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
September, 2021
  • September 10, 2021: [Order]
  • September 10, 2021: [Judgment]
  • September 09, 2021: [Judgment]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 24, 2021: [Judgment]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Order]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • May 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 07, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 15, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
  • December 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: [Order]
  • October 14, 2020: [Order]
September, 2020
  • September 02, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • September 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 28, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 28, 2020: [Order]
  • August 28, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
  • August 21, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • August 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • August 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 14, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 13, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • August 13, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Review of Release/Detention Order i/c/w 18 USC 3145]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 28, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • July 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 16, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • July 07, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • July 07, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 06, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Order]
  • June 26, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • June 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 25, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • June 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 25, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 25, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.