U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-00018-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ADDISON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Judgment]
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2020
  • October 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 02, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 29, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 29, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 29, 2020: [Order]
  • June 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • June 26, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.