U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-00021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DAVIS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Order]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Order]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • May 11, 2021: [Order]
  • May 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2021
  • April 02, 2021: [Order]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order]
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 14, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
  • October 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
  • August 06, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 06, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 06, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.