U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:20-cr-00019-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. NELSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2021
  • April 13, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 13, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • April 13, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • April 13, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 08, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.