U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-00024-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MAXWELL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 05, 2021: [Judgment]
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
April, 2021
  • April 02, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • November 19, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
  • October 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
  • August 05, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • August 04, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 04, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
July, 2020
  • July 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.