U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-00022-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. FRANKLIN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Judgment]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 02, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 02, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 02, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.