U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cr-00026-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HILLMAN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 30, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order]
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 26, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 26, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 09, 2020: [COVID-19 Public Health and Safety Standing Order]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.