U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00019-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. POWERS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 02, 2024: [Order on Sentence Reduction - USSC Amendment - Amendment 821]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Judgment]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Judgment]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Order]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 15, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Order]
  • October 01, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 01, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • October 01, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
September, 2020
  • September 15, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 15, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • September 15, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • September 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.