U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-00026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LAWRENCE, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
September, 2022
  • September 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 23, 2021: [Order on Ex Parte Motion]
  • July 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2021
  • June 08, 2021: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
April, 2021
  • April 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 07, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
December, 2020
  • December 08, 2020: [Order]
  • December 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • November 20, 2020: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • November 20, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 20, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 19, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 19, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 19, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
  • October 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • August 24, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 24, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • August 24, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.