U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-mj-00066-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HODGE
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: [Judgment]
December, 2020
  • December 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
October, 2020
  • October 13, 2020: [COVID-19 Public Health and Safety Standing Order]
September, 2020
  • September 09, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.