U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:20-cr-00024-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. CATER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Order]
April, 2021
  • April 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 14, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 10, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 10, 2020: [Order]
  • September 10, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • September 10, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.