U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-00024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. FAIR, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Order of Detention]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Order on Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 26, 2021: [Order on Ex Parte Motion]
  • July 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2021
  • May 06, 2021: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 20, 2020: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • November 20, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 20, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 20, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 23, 2020: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • October 22, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 22, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 14, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • October 11, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 11, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 08, 2020: [Order of Detention]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • September 22, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.