U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:20-cr-00041-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MASON et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 03, 2022: [Judgment]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
September, 2021
  • September 03, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [Order]
  • September 23, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 22, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 22, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 22, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.