U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-00030-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. JAMES
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Judgment]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2020
  • October 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • September 23, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 23, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 23, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.