U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-00029-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. TODD
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Judgment]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Order to Surrender]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
April, 2021
  • April 09, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Declare Case Complex]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [Order]
  • September 23, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 23, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 23, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.