U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00023-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. WOODEN et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 23, 2021: [Judgment]
  • November 05, 2021: [Oral Order]
August, 2021
  • August 04, 2021: [Order of Dismissal]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Order]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Order]
  • April 27, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • April 27, 2021: [Order of Detention]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 15, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 24, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 24, 2020: [Order]
  • November 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • November 24, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 17, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Order]
  • October 14, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 14, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.