U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-00035-1
  • Case Name: USA v. RICHARDSON, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Want of Prosecution]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Order]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 08, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 08, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 04, 2020: [Order]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.