U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-00032-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. FORD
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [Judgment]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order]
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
  • December 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
  • October 06, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 06, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 06, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 05, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.