U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:20-cr-00047-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SCOTT et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Terminate Motions]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 04, 2022: [Judgment]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 18, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 18, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 18, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • March 18, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 12, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 12, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 12, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 12, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
  • December 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
November, 2020
  • November 10, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 10, 2020: [Order]
  • November 10, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: [COVID-19 Public Health and Safety Standing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.