U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-00048-1
  • Case Name: USA v. FRANKLIN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Judgment]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 20, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • November 20, 2020: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • November 20, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 20, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.