U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:20-cr-00033-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WRIGHT
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • July 05, 2022: [Judgment]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • August 31, 2021: [Order on Joint Motion]
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Order]
  • June 11, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Declare Case Complex]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
  • December 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
November, 2020
  • November 04, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • November 04, 2020: [Order]
  • November 03, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • November 03, 2020: [Order]
  • November 02, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 02, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 02, 2020: [Order of Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.