U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-mj-00084-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. PRIKHODKO
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Judgment]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 03, 2021: [Order]
January, 2021
  • January 07, 2021: [Order]
  • January 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Pretrial]
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
November, 2020
  • November 06, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 06, 2020: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • November 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Modify]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.