U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-00027-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. COXTON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Judgment]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order]
  • February 11, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 28, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 21, 2021: [Order]
  • January 21, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 09, 2020: [Order]
  • December 03, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • December 03, 2020: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • December 03, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 03, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
November, 2020
  • November 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.