U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-mj-00076-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. EVANUK et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
April, 2021
  • April 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • March 05, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 17, 2020: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • November 17, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 17, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.