U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-mj-00055-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. RICHARDSON
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Bond Forfeiture]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order to Surrender]
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Judgment]
  • March 05, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • November 17, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 17, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.