U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-mj-00077-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. LANEY
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2021
  • May 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • March 05, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2020
  • November 18, 2020: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • November 18, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 18, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.