U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mj-00061-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SIMMONDS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 13, 2021: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • April 08, 2021: [Judgment]
  • April 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
March, 2021
  • March 03, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 15, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 15, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 15, 2020: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • December 04, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.