U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-00061-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. COOPER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
April, 2021
  • April 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 12, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 07, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 05, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • January 05, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
December, 2020
  • December 11, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.