U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00031-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SEYKOSKI
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Judgment]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 15, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 16, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 15, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 15, 2020: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.