U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cr-00038-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. GREGORIO-CARDONA
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 05, 2021: [Judgment]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • January 07, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • January 07, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 07, 2021: [Interpreter Appointed]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • December 21, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.