U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:09-cr-00031-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Willis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
March, 2021
  • March 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2021
  • January 07, 2021: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.