U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00001-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. WESTBROOK et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2025
  • January 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Judgment]
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Order]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
September, 2021
  • September 10, 2021: [Order]
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Declare Case Complex]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 16, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • February 16, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • February 15, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 13, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.