U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-00060-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. DATES
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Judgment]
July, 2021
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
June, 2021
  • June 04, 2021: [Order]
April, 2021
  • April 01, 2021: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 12, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 11, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • February 11, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 11, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.