U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WEAVER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Judgment]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 01, 2021: [Protective Order]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • February 01, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 29, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • January 29, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 25, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.