U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LOCKETT et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 03, 2022: [Judgment]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 21, 2022: [Judgment]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Judgment]
  • November 04, 2021: [Judgment]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
  • October 06, 2021: [Judgment]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • September 10, 2021: [Judgment]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Judgment]
  • July 13, 2021: [Order to Surrender]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order on Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • May 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Review of Release/Detention Order i/c/w 18 USC 3145]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • February 26, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 25, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 25, 2021: [Order]
  • February 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • February 23, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 22, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • February 22, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • February 22, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 22, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 17, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • February 16, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • February 16, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 12, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 11, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • February 11, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 11, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 11, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 08, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 08, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • February 08, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 08, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 03, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 01, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 01, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • February 01, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 01, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • January 29, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 29, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 29, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 28, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 28, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 28, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • January 28, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.