U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-mj-00015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DEANDA, et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 05, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 17, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • February 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.