U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SEALED
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Judgment]
November, 2024
  • November 07, 2024: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 24, 2021: [Order]
  • May 24, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • May 21, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 21, 2021: [Order of Detention]
April, 2021
  • April 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.