U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00010-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. GAUSE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Judgment]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Amended Motion]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2021
  • April 06, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • April 06, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.