U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-00053-3
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. CAREY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Sentence Reduction - USSC Amendment - Amendment 821]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • October 21, 2022: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • October 20, 2022: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • October 06, 2022: [Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Judgment of Acquittal]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 18, 2021: [Order]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 11, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 11, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order]
  • June 10, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 10, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • May 11, 2021: [Order]
  • May 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [Order]
  • April 07, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 06, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • April 06, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.